skip to content

Matzko, Alexander

CPSO#: 21182

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jan 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 20-Jan-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1997