skip to content

Matusa, Elena

CPSO#: 97631

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
781 Richmond St
London ON  N6A 3H4
Phone: 519-680-7772
Fax: 519-937-9160 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elena Matusa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Matusa ( CPSO# 97631 )

Business Address:
1 - 1304 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 680-7772

Business Address:
Suite 303
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 680-7773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELENA MATUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATUSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 31 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015