skip to content

Mattia, Alicia Marie

CPSO#: 95647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Segal Mattia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mattia ( CPSO# 95647 )
Dr. D. Segal ( CPSO# 95765 )

Business Address:
3250 Schmon Parkway
Unit 10
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (289) 479-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:17 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALICIA MARIE MATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 29 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017