Matthies, Norah-Faye (CPSO#: 101191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room 302
100 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1L5
Phone: (416) 946-7957
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan A. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Paul ( CPSO# 105159)
Dr. N. Matthies ( CPSO# 101191)

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor East Wing
Room 400
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5839

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORAH-FAYE MATTHIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018