skip to content

Matthews, Nicola Elizabeth

CPSO#: 92236

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301 Ext. 481
Fax: 6133548244 Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLA ELIZABETH MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Nov 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017