skip to content

Matisoff, Andrew Jeffrey

CPSO#: 87686

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Virginia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2008