skip to content

Mathur, Avdesh Narain

CPSO#: 22625

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Apr 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 6-Oct-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:Bihar University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Sudbury Cardiac Research Tel: (705) 522-7232
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014