skip to content

Belanger, Mathieu

CPSO#: 94840

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 01 Feb 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1328 Labrie Ave
Inovo Medical
Gloucester ON  K1B 3M1
Phone: (613) 749-4668 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mathieu Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Belanger ( CPSO# 94840 )

Business Address:
Inovo Medical
1328 Labrie Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1B 3M1
Phone Number: (613) 749-4668

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2022
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2023
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Aug 2023

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 12 Dec 2022
Summary:

Le 12 décembre 2022, le Tribunal a conclu que le Dr Bélanger n'a pas respecté les normes d’exercice de la profession :
  • en tenant des dossiers médicaux inadéquats;
  • en employant dans sa clinique des procédures inadéquates de prévention et de contrôle des infections qui ont causé un préjudice à un patient; et
  • en continuant d’utiliser un flacon de chlorure de calcium cassé, mettant ainsi le patient à des risques de prejudice. 
Le Tribunal a également conclu que le Dr Bélanger s’est livré à une conduite honteuse, déshonorante ou non professionnelle :
  • en demandant à un membre du personnel d’utiliser les  informations d’identification d’un autre médecin pour remplir une demande de consultation dans le DME;
  • en effectuant dans sa clinique des procédures qui n’étaient pas autorisées, puisque la clinique avait échoué à une inspection effectuée par l’Ordre dans le cadre du programme d’inspection des établissements situés hors du milieu hospitalier; et
  • en facturant de manière inappropriée des services au Régime d’assurance-santé de l’Ontario 146 fois en indiquant deux codes différents dans des cas où il n'a pas consigné les éléments requis pour les codes soumis.
Le Tribunal a ordonné  : 
  • au Dr Bélanger de se présenter devant le sous-comité pour être réprimandé;
  • au registrateur de suspendre le certificat d’inscription du Dr Bélanger pour une période de six mois à compter du 1er février 2023;
  • au registrateur d'imposer des conditions et des restrictions au certificat d’inscription du Dr Bélanger;
  • au Dr Bélanger de payer les frais judiciaires de l’Ordre, d’un montant de 6 000 $, au plus tard le 11 janvier 2023. 
Vous trouverez de plus amples détails dans les motifs de décision. Voir le lien ci-dessous. Les motifs du TDMCO sont également accessibles au www.opsdt.ca/fr et au https://www.canlii.org/fr/on/onpsdt/. Vous pouvez obtenir les pièces présentées lors de l'audience, y compris l’exposé conjoint des faits, en communiquant avec le greffe du Tribunal au [email protected]

On December 12, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Bélanger failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession by:
  • keeping inadequate records;
  • engaging in inadequate infection prevention and control procedures at his clinic that caused harm to a patient; an
  • continuing to use a broken bottle of calcium chloride, exposing the patient to risk.  
The Tribunal also found that Dr. Bélanger engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by:
  • directing a staff member to make a referral in the EMR using another physician’s identification information;
  • performing procedures in his clinic that were not permitted to be performed there after the clinic received a fail from the College’s Out of Hospital Premises Inspection Program; and
  • improperly billing OHIP 147 times under two different codes when the conditions for those codes were not met.
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  • Dr. Bélanger attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
  • the Registrar suspend Dr. Bélanger’s certificate of registration for six months commencing February 1, 2023;
  • the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bélanger’s certificate of registration;
  • Dr. Bélanger pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 by January 11, 2023. 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-12-12

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mathieu Bélanger has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Bélanger is a family physician who practises in the area of interventional pain management. Dr. Bélanger currently works at, and owns, the Inovo Medical clinic in Ottawa, a clinic that provides interventional pain management procedures. Dr. Bélanger was the Medical Director of Inovo. Following referral of this matter to discipline and at the request of the College, Dr. Bélanger appointed an acting Medical Director, effective August 22, 2017.

Nerve blocks, which are categorized as Level 2 Interventional Pain Management procedures, are only authorized to be performed in an Out-of-Hospital premises (“OHP”) that is approved by the College. Between October 15 and January 2016, Dr. Bélanger provided interventional pain treatments to patients, including Level 2 nerve blocks, while working in a clinic that was not an approved OHP.

Dr. Bélanger was aware of the requirement that Level 2 procedures can only be performed in an OHP that has been approved and that responsibility for notifying the College’s OHP program is on the physician. He was aware that the clinic where he was performing Level 2 procedures was not an approved OHP, had never been inspected under the Out of Hospital Premises Inspection Program, did not meet program requirements and that he was not authorized to provide Level 2 procedures in that location.

There is no evidence that Dr. Bélanger’s performance of any of these procedures caused any harm to any patients.

As part of the College investigation, information was obtained from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”). The information from OHIP confirms that Dr. Bélanger submitted claims to OHIP between October 21, 2015 and January 13, 2016, for Level 2 procedures, particularly nerve blocks, that were performed by Dr. Bélanger at the clinic that was not an approved OHP. The OHIP information indicates that between October 21, 2015 and January 13, 2016, Dr. Bèlanger billed approximately $103,428.00 for performing Level 2 procedures in the clinic that was not an approved OHP, that are only authorized to be performed in an OHP.

DISPOSITION

The Discipline Committee ordered that:

- The Registrar suspend Dr. Bélanger’s Certificate of Registration for a five (5) month period, effective February 17th, 2018 at 12:01 a.m.
- The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bélanger’s Certificate of Registration:
o Dr. Bélanger will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and
professionalism, at his own expense, within (twelve) 12 months of the date of this
Order, or any alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. Dr. Bélanger will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program
and provide proof of completion to the College;
o Approval of the College’s Out of Hospital Premises program is required before Dr.
Bélanger resumes the Medical Director role in an Out of Hospital Premises.
- Dr. Bélanger to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Bélanger to pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 15, 2018