skip to content

Mathew, Rebecca Thomas

CPSO#: 97673

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institut
Cardiology
Phone: 613-696-7406
Fax: 613-696-7248

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:14 Jan 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:11 Jan 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA THOMAS MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 14 Jan 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 11 Jan 2021
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018