Mathew, Philip (CPSO#: 100822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Calicut University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CELERION
621 ROSE STREET
LINCOLN NE  68502
United States
Phone: (402) 476-2811

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
USA - Nebraska
USA - New Jersey

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Philip Mathew may practise medicine independently in internal medicine as a
            qualified investigator, only.