skip to content

Mathew, Andrew Luka

CPSO#: 91865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196633120
Fax: 5196633147 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW LUKA MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Apr 2017
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2017 to 31 May 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015