skip to content

Mather, Mahomed Saied

CPSO#: 27156

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brantford General Hospital, 200 Terrace Hill Street, Brantford, ON, N3R 1G9
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016