skip to content

Mather, Dawood Gulam

CPSO#: 25481

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 25-May-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dawood Mather Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2012