skip to content

Mathai, Shyla Rachel

CPSO#: 92568

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Medicine
Hospitalist, Oncology & Rehab
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shyla R. Mathai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathai ( CPSO# 92568 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Medicine
Hospitalist Service
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011 Active
 Dr. Shyla Rachel Mathai may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.