skip to content

Matava, Clyde Tonderayi

CPSO#: 86046

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Matava, Cliade Tonderayi (used until: 07 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Matava ( CPSO# 86046 )
Dr. R. Matava ( CPSO# 86349 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:12 Sep 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 16 Apr 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
EL - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 20 Feb 2008 to 13 May 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 14 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Clyde Tonderayi Matava may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anesthesia,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Matava holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires when Dr. Matava no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.