skip to content

Masri, Rogy Omar

CPSO#: 85865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay ON  P1B5A4
Phone: 705 474 8600 Ext. 4500 Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 13, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 12, 2014, Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Rogy O. Masri's privileges were revoked, effective February 13, 2014,

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Jan 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 Sep 2021 Active
 As from June 15, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rogy Omar Masri in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Masri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ROGY OMAR MASRI
("Dr. Masri")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Masri, certificate of registration number 85865, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1115269 (the "Investigation") into my care of a patient in the emergency department.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Masri, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Masri, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:     
       
1.	Medical Records Documentation, College policy;

2.	Transitions in Care, College policy; 

3.	Shoulder dislocation and reduction, UpToDate, September 17, 2020; 

4.	The College's Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism and College Policies, in particular, the section on "Duties of Physicians.collectively to the public, advocating for a Safe Health Care System"; and

5.	CMPA's Good Practices Guide - Patient Safety - Just Culture.

(b)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Masri, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that if any of the policies/resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Masri, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(9)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(12)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(13)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Masri's care of a patient in the emergency department. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Masri will engage in professional education, including in the management and documentation of shoulder injuries/dislocation and ensuring appropriate transitions in care.

(c)	I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(14)	I, Dr. Masri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15)	I, Dr. Masri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Masri, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.








Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 15, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rogy Omar Masri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 15, 2021:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Masri’s care of a patient in the emergency department. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Masri will engage in professional education, including in the management and documentation of shoulder injuries/dislocation and ensuring appropriate transitions in care.