skip to content

Masoudi, Parviz

CPSO#: 91220

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Department Internal Medicine
Mackenzie-health
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883 1212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289 597 7676
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Parviz Masoudi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Masoudi ( CPSO# 91220 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:23 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2009 to 11 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2018 Active
             Dr. Parviz Masoudi may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.