skip to content

Masood, Khaja Mohammed

CPSO#: 23440

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 6-Jan-2020

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Khaja Masood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Khaja Mohammed Masood to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 14, 2017:

Dr. Masood's sleep medicine practice was assessed by the College and, as a result, Dr. Masood must not practise or engage in sleep medicine at this time.

Dr. Masood shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Masood must not practice or engage in sleep medicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".