skip to content

Masood, Ali Khaja

CPSO#: 92455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011 Active
 Dr.  Ali  Khaja Masood may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine
            in a hospital setting, only.