skip to content

Mason, Robin Liang Dominic

CPSO#: 28428

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Mason's medical records are being stored at: Acne Treatment Clinic Suite 412 4190 Finch Ave E. Scarborough, ON M1S 4T7 Alternative inquiries may be made at: Acne Treatment Clinic Suite 406 1366 Yonge St. Toronto, ON M4T 3A7
Date Received: 03 Apr 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Mar 2013