skip to content

Mason, Michael

CPSO#: 101197

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C2
Phone: (705)6455331
Fax: (705)6450057 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2016