skip to content

Maskerine, Courtney Rae

CPSO#: 91461

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Family Medicine
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone: (613) 241-3344 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COURTNEY RAE MASKERINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASKERINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 26 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2011 to 26 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2011