skip to content

Mascioli, Kelly Joanna

CPSO#: 96156

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: (613) 761-3603 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kelly Mascioli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mascioli ( CPSO# 96156 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4581

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: 613-722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY JOANNA MASCIOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCIOLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2016