skip to content

Martyniak, Dawid Jan

CPSO#: 93596

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Clinic
200-785 Wonderland South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Martyniak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93436 )
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )

Business Address:
Colborne family Medical Centre
612 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 673-1962

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAWID JAN MARTYNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTYNIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012