skip to content

Martorelli, Christina Marie

CPSO#: 97583

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
MUSC B101
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 27700
Fax: (905) 546-0805 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cicero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martorelli ( CPSO# 97583 )
Dr. M. Cicero ( CPSO# 97543 )

Business Address:
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 742-2636

Business Address:
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
MUSC B101
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE MARTORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTORELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014