skip to content

Martins, Jennifer Natalie

CPSO#: 100270

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite D2.050.B
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: (613) 548-5580 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 430-4055
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER NATALIE MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018