skip to content

Martinez Cajas, Jorge Luis

CPSO#: 90049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Room 3010 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6000 Ext. 75471
Fax: (613) 533-6863 Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JORGE LUIS MARTINEZ CAJAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINEZ CAJAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013