skip to content

Martin del Campo, Jose Cuauhtemoc

CPSO#: 31745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Apr 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite WW5-443
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5055
Fax: (416) 603-5366 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Martin del Campo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martin del Campo ( CPSO# 31745 )

Business Address:
Suite WW5-443
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSE CUAUHTEMOC MARTIN DEL CAMPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN DEL CAMPO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1989