skip to content

Martin, Wayne Leonard

CPSO#: 30699

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Windosr Family Health Team Suite 245 2475 McDougall Drive Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2004 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016