skip to content

Martin, Leslie Joyce

CPSO#: 97925

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juraviski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 43790
Fax: 905-575-2645 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Leslie Joyce Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin ( CPSO# 97925 )

Business Address:
Juraviski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLIE JOYCE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017