skip to content

Martin, James Andrew

CPSO#: 33318

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
88 Wentworth Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2Y9
Phone: (905) 522-3563
Fax: (905) 522-3564 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 9055224941
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martin ( CPSO# 33318 )

Business Address:
88 Wentworth Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2Y9
Phone Number: (905) 522-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES ANDREW MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1982