skip to content

Martin, Isabelle

CPSO#: 89163

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: Bourque, Isabelle (used until: 30 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
Lambton College
1457 London Rd
Sarnia ON  N7S 6K4
Phone: (519) 542-7751 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Martin ( CPSO# 89033 )
Dr. I. Martin ( CPSO# 89163 )

Business Address:
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-2949

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ISABELLE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018