skip to content

Martin, Glynn Robert

CPSO#: 98423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-182 Pinebush Rd
Pinebush Medical Clinic
Cambridge ON  N1R 8J8
Phone: 5196210909
Fax: 519-658-0580 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Glynn Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Martin ( CPSO# 98423 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 622-2019

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
202-182 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON  N1R 8J8
Phone Number: 519-621-0909

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GLYNN ROBERT MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2019