skip to content

Marshall, Joseph Gilbert

CPSO#: 22908

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sue Garib Unit 35 - 7000 Bathurst Street Thornhill ON L4J 7Y3 905 881 6510
Instructions: Write or call the above for medical record requests
Date Received: 10 Dec 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 2018