skip to content

Marshall, John Christopher

CPSO#: 30263

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing 4-007
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5225
Fax: (416) 864-5141 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Christopher Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 30263 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
4-007 - 4th Floor Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990