skip to content

Marryatt, Colin Halford Edward

CPSO#: 26866

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.