skip to content

Marriott, John Anthony Sefton

CPSO#: 23082

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 27 Jan 2017


Address: 392 6th Concession Road East, Millgrove, ON, L8B 1M5, (905) 690-1804
Date Received: 05 Dec 2016


Address: Joseph Brant Hospital (905) 632-3730 ext. 4117, North Halton Mental Health (905) 825-6000, Bruce Shoreline Mental Health (519) 797-2880, Saugeen Memorial Hospital (519) 376-2121
Date Received: 05 Dec 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 2016