skip to content

Marriott, Anne Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30430

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017
Corporation Name: Marriott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 24 Feb 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019