skip to content

Marriage, Samantha Jane Mills

CPSO#: 95734

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 462-8272 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samantha Marriage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marriage ( CPSO# 95734 )

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B5
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON  M4C 3E7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JANE MILLS MARRIAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2014