skip to content

Marquis, Jean-Francois

CPSO#: 30444

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jean-Francois Marquis Medicine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Chief Cardiology Ottawa Heart Institute RM 3509 40 Ruskin Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Date Received: 22 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2019