skip to content

Marlborough, Michelle Alexandra

CPSO#: 95104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Hospital
Operational Stress Injury Clinic
550 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4292 Ext. 42399 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 Mar 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ALEXANDRA MARLBOROUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARLBOROUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 25 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 16 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 16 Nov 2016 to 05 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2017