skip to content

Prieditis, Markus Paul

CPSO#: 64097

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Prieditis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Prieditis ( CPSO# 64097 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARKUS PAUL PRIEDITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIEDITIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992