skip to content

Markus, Jurgita Rachel

CPSO#: 87217

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Names: Treigys, Jurgita (used until: 17 Oct 2011 )     Treigiene, Jurgita (used until: 19 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:Kaunas State University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 7628 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jurgita R. Markus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Markus ( CPSO# 87217 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JURGITA RACHEL MARKUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012