skip to content

Marks, Alexander

CPSO#: 23357

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: West Park Healthcare Centre 82 Buttonwood Avenue Toronto ON M6M 2J5
Date Received: 28 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019