Markowski, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 98705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1455 Lakeshore Road, Unit G14
Burlington ON  L7S2J1
Phone: 9056318787
Fax: 9056318786
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Markowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Markowski ( CPSO# 98705 )

Business Address:
Suite G14
1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 2J1
Phone Number: (905) 541-2274

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE MARKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017