skip to content

Markose, George

CPSO#: 94765

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charing Cross Hospital Medical School, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Henderson General Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Lower Level
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-4551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton St. E.
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
365 West St.
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite#103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
169 Main Street E
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: 9059452253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: George Markose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Markose ( CPSO# 94765 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-4551

Business Address:
Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
103-2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-1966


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Sep 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Interventional Radiology Effective:25 Sep 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2020 Active
 Dr. GEORGE MARKOSE may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology and interventional radiology.