skip to content

Xu, Mark

CPSO#: 103205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Eye MD Clinic
89 Dawson Road, Suite 214
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 265-9022
Fax: (226) 486-0170 Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019