skip to content

Trozzi, Mark Raymond

CPSO#: 62778

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 08 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jason P. Heavens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2022
Corporation Name: Trozzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 28 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2022

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Mark Raymond Trozzi’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Trozzi engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his communications, including but not limited to communications by email and on online/digital platforms, regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues, including but not limited to making misleading, incorrect or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19; and that Dr. Trozzi is incompetent in relation to his communications, outlined above.

It is also alleged that Dr. Trozzi is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients.

It is also alleged that Dr. Trozzi engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable period of time to a written inquiry from the College, including in failing to cooperate with the College’s investigations by failing to provide information, records and documents requested by the College.

It is also alleged that Dr. Trozzi engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and is ungovernable, in light of his conduct and his public communications regarding the College and its regulatory functions.
 
This proceeding has been heard by the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. The panel reserved its decision. The reasons for decision will be released shortly.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing Case Management: 2022-10-21; Motions: 2022-09-07; 2022-11-23; 2023-03-10; Merits: 2023-06-13 to 16; 2023-06-19; 2023-07-11 to 12; 2023-07-17