skip to content

Trozzi, Mark Raymond

CPSO#: 62778

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jason P. Heavens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Trozzi ( CPSO# 62778 )
Dr. J. Heavens ( CPSO# 71580 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings
1 H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825


Corporation Name: Trozzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 28 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 15 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2021 Active
 As from 11:59 p.m., October 15, 2021, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mark Raymond Trozzi:

Practice Restriction 
(1)	Dr. Trozzi shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to vaccines for COVID-19;
(2)	Dr. Trozzi shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to mask requirements for COVID-19; 
(3)	Dr. Trozzi shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to testing for COVID-19.
Posting a Sign and Translations 
(4)	Dr. Trozzi shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not he is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Schedule "A." If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Trozzi shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Trozzi must not provide medical exemptions in relation to COVID-19 vaccines, mask requirements or testing. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
(5)	Dr. Trozzi shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides services, of the sign described in (4) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". 
(6)	Dr. Trozzi shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (5) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;
(7)	The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.
Notification of Practice Locations
(8)	Dr. Trozzi shall inform the College of each and every location at which he practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s), office(s) and virtual care setting(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at or accepting patients from that location.
Monitoring
(9)	Dr. Trozzi shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, provide to the College his irrevocable consent in the form attached at Schedule "B" for the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order.
(10)	Dr. Trozzi shall maintain a log of all professional encounters with patients, including both in-person encounters and encounters in a virtual setting, in the form attached at Schedule "C" ("Patient Log"). Dr. Trozzi shall include in the Patient Log the name of each patient with whom he has a professional encounter and the date of the encounter; the patient's date of birth; the reason for the visit; and the type of visit (i.e., telemedicine or in-person).
(11)	Dr. Trozzi shall provide a copy of the Patient Log to the College every two (2) weeks, or at any other time as requested by the College. 
(12)	Dr. Trozzi shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Trozzi's compliance with the terms of this Order.
(13)	Dr. Trozzi shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.