skip to content

Neufeld, Mark Victor

CPSO#: 66783

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
450 Speedvale Avenue West
Guelph ON  N1H 7Y6
Phone: (519) 822-5501
Fax: (519) 836-0783 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mark V. Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK VICTOR NEUFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2000